skip to content

Brassard, Stephane Joseph Leger

CPSO#: 95851

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Emergency Department
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111 Ext. 51502 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephane Brassard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brassard ( CPSO# 95851 )

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5

Business Address:
Canadian Forces Health Services Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANE JOSEPH LEGER BRASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRASSARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2014