Brassard, Danielle (CPSO#: 99649)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Laval University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 820 McConnell Avenue, Cornwall, ON K6H 4M4
Date Received: 27 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 11 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2015