skip to content

Brankston, Edwin Russell

CPSO#: 29312

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King St. E.
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

OSHAWA GENERAL HOSPITAL
1 Hospital Court
OSHAWA ONTARIO
L1G 2B9
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edwin R. Brankston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWIN RUSSELL BRANKSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANKSTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2022