skip to content

Brandon, Nicholas Charlie

CPSO#: 92763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Public Health
7th Floor
7120 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5M 2C2
Phone: (905) 791-7800
Fax: 905-565-1456 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leslieville Medical Centre
17 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Canada
Phone: (416) 465-6606
Fax: (416) 465-6609
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bay College Medical and
Lockwood Diagnostics
Suite 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-1900
Fax: (416) 929-7316
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Carlton and Church Medical
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B1J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
Fax: (416) 646-1892
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

222 Lansdowne Ave, Suite 200
Toronto ON  M6K 3C6
Canada
Phone: (647) 725-6555
Fax: (647) 725-6556
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:01 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS CHARLIE BRANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012