skip to content

Brandigampola, Sarah Nicole

CPSO#: 98380

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208-1355 Bank St
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: 613-737-8069
Fax: 613-737-8318 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brandigampola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brandigampola ( CPSO# 98380 )

Business Address:
Suite 208 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H K7
Phone Number: 613-737-8955

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 May 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH NICOLE BRANDIGAMPOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDIGAMPOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 26 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 26 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 26 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 19 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019