skip to content

Branch, Charles Farrell

CPSO#: 96337

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Minnesota, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone: (807) 285-1894
Fax: (807) 285-2098 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

TBay Regional Health Science Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6100
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shannon J. Wesley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wesley ( CPSO# 89615 )
Dr. C. Branch ( CPSO# 96337 )

Business Address:
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLES FARRELL BRANCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013