skip to content

Bral, Mariusz

CPSO#: 91950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Canada

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIUSZ BRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 Aug 2009 to 25 Oct 2009
AVP - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Oct 2009 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2020