skip to content

Brahm, Gary Lee

CPSO#: 86826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55676 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brahm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Brahm ( CPSO# 86826 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GARY LEE BRAHM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAHM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2013