skip to content

Brady, Stephen Clarke

CPSO#: 32111

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2010