skip to content

Bradwell, Peter John

CPSO#: 26996

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter John Bradwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016