skip to content

Bradshaw, Scott H

CPSO#: 90671

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
310-1024 McGarry Terr
Nepean ON  K2J 6R3 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Scott Bradshaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bradshaw ( CPSO# 90671 )

Business Address:
Dynacare
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 6S4
Phone Number: (613) 453-1860

Business Address:
281 Infusion Private
Ottawa ON  K2J 5X3
Phone Number: (613) 453-1860

Business Address:
1024 McGarry Terr
Apt 310
Nepean ON  K2J 6R3


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:22 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SCOTT H BRADSHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADSHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015