skip to content

McCuaig, Bradley Michael

CPSO#: 64942

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 579-5311
Fax: (519) 579-2339 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bradley McCuaig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McCuaig ( CPSO# 64942 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 579-5311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRADLEY MICHAEL MCCUAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCUAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Infectious Diseases

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993