skip to content

Bradford, Lesley Jane

CPSO#: 30181

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 28-Apr-2011

Former Name: Pelman, Lesley Jane (used until: 27 Sep 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jan 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001