skip to content

Boyle, Shawna Lee

CPSO#: 89599

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Nebraska

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:25 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAWNA LEE BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2021