skip to content

Boyle, Matthew Thomas

CPSO#: 95908

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Suite FG-38
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 4089
Fax: 416-480-5119 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab Campus
Suite S-211
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Canada
Phone: 416-226-6780
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boyle ( CPSO# 95908 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Suite FG-38
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab Campus
Suite S-211
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone Number: (416) 226-6780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW THOMAS BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016