skip to content

Boyle, Marjory Helena

CPSO#: 17849

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 15 Jun 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Mar 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1995
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.