skip to content

Boyle, Karl Oliver

CPSO#: 94258

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Karl Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Health Records E123 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 23 Oct 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2017