skip to content

Boyle, David Arthur

CPSO#: 26211

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David A. Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013