skip to content

Boyd, Stephanie Mary

CPSO#: 85977

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kelowna General Hospital
2268 Pandosy St.
Kelowna BC  V1Y 1T2
Phone: (250) 862-4000

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

700 Ross Ave E
Timmins and District Hospital
Emergency Department
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: 705-267-6311
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. M. Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARY BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2007 to 04 Apr 2007
EL - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2008