skip to content

Boyce, James Ronald

CPSO#: 20906

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Sep 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Mar 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 1983