skip to content

Bowdin, Sarah Claire Chantal

CPSO#: 89621

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017