skip to content

Mikhail, Boutros Behnam Metry

CPSO#: 97445

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
188 East Main Street
Welland ON  L3B 3W8
Phone: (905) 714-9364
Fax: 905-714-0438 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Boutros Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mikhail ( CPSO# 97445 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BOUTROS BEHNAM METRY MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012