skip to content

Boutillier, Anna Lois Wanda

CPSO#: 97696

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4000 Bridle Path Dr
Ottawa ON  K1T 2C4 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anna Boutillier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boutillier ( CPSO# 97696 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA LOIS WANDA BOUTILLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTILLIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015