skip to content

Boutet, Andre Jean

CPSO#: 27620

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 2007
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.