skip to content

Bourns, Robert Evans

CPSO#: 28427

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Bourns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Halton Hills Family Health 171 Guelph St Georgetown ON L7G 4A1
Date Received: 03 Dec 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2019