skip to content

Bourns, Laura Elizabeth

CPSO#: 92990

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Ontario
661 University
17th Floor
M5G 1M1
Toronto ON  L5M 2C1
Phone: 647-260-7100 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H8N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 821-5834
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH BOURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016