skip to content

Bournival, Emily Marie

CPSO#: 100436

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY MARIE BOURNIVAL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOURNIVAL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BOURNIVAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOURNIVAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BOURNIVAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOURNIVAL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOURNIVAL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018