Bourne, Jennifer Julia (CPSO#: 100340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
545 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3H 0C4
Phone: (416) 633-2345
Fax: (416) 633-2216
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Gillingham Dr
Brampton ON  L6X 0G9
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-1937
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER JULIA BOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2017