skip to content

Bourdeau, Gilles Viateur

CPSO#: 28196

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Inc., Suite 411 1230 Old Innes Road, Ottawa, ON K1B 3V3
Date Received: 08 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2015