skip to content

Bould, Matthew Dylan

CPSO#: 87011

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hosp Of Eastern Ontario
Department Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dylan Bould Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Matthew Dylan Bould may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Bould holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bould no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.