skip to content

Boulanger-Gobeil, Cindy

CPSO#: 99300

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 07 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017