skip to content

Boulanger, Maude

CPSO#: 92868

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3410 Sheppard Avenue East, Suite 20
Toronto ON  M1T3K4 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chugh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chugh ( CPSO# 84794 )
Dr. M. Boulanger ( CPSO# 92868 )

Business Address:
25 William Graham Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 3G3
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
14845 Yonge Street
Suite 301
Aurora ON  L4G 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950


Corporation Name: Boulanger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boulanger ( CPSO# 92868 )

Business Address:
25 William Graham Dr
Aurora ON  L4G 3G3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAUDE BOULANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012