skip to content

Boughan, Diana Jean Lawrie

CPSO#: 98315

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Boughan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boughan ( CPSO# 98315 )

Business Address:
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Business Address:
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Business Address:
21 McGivern Street
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIANA JEAN LAWRIE BOUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUGHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2015