skip to content

Boudreau, Heather Sarah Ross

CPSO#: 86223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Ross Boudreau, Heather Sarah (used until: 12 May 2008 )     Ross, Heather Sarah (used until: 20 Dec 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
888 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C6
Phone: (705) 222-2627
Fax: (705) 222-3703 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. S. Boudreau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Boudreau ( CPSO# 86223 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
888 Regent Street
#202
Sudbury ON  P3E C6
Phone Number: 705-222-2627

Business Address:
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Lower Level
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone Number: (705) 222-2627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:28 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER SARAH ROSS BOUDREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011