skip to content

Boudana, David Andre

CPSO#: 95479

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Lille II, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McLean Plastic Surgery Clinic
50 Burnhamthorpe Rd W, Suite 343
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone: 1-866-856-6091 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr David Boudana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boudana ( CPSO# 95479 )

Business Address:
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West, Suite 343,
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:27 Jan 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE BOUDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2020