skip to content

Boucher, Liza

CPSO#: 96212

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Forensic Services and
Coroner's Complex
25 Morton Shulman Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: 6473291873 Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Forensic Pathology Service 25 Morton Shulman Avenue Toronto, ON M3M 0B1
Date Received: 30 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LIZA BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2018