skip to content

Boucher, Francois-Gilles

CPSO#: 28462

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Bruyere Family Health Team 75 Bruyere Street Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018