skip to content

Botterell, Edmund Henry

CPSO#: 10247

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1930

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1937 RCPSC Specialist
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Jan 1946 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1936
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1995