skip to content

Botschner, Monika Karen

CPSO#: 94620

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016