skip to content

Bothwell, Stuart Mckay

CPSO#: 89085

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone: (705) 880-0501
Fax: (705) 880-0505 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Stuart Bothwell & Naomi Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bothwell ( CPSO# 89085 )
Dr. N. Nicholson ( CPSO# 89482 )

Business Address:
208 - 189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone Number: (705) 880-0501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STUART MCKAY BOTHWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTHWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010