skip to content

Botha, Nicolaas Jacobus

CPSO#: 90111

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of the Orange Free State, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicolaas Botha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013