skip to content

Bostwick, Joanna Alexis

CPSO#: 88592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 4212 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joanna Bostwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bostwick ( CPSO# 88592 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:24 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOANNA ALEXIS BOSTWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSTWICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010