skip to content

Boshart, Samantha Leigh

CPSO#: 96317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
785 Techumseh Rd
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 4K9
Phone: 5193975455
Fax: 5196274436 Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA LEIGH BOSHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSHART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015