skip to content

Boscariol, Rya Heather

CPSO#: 88600

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-675-4733 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

205 Douglas Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1E9
Canada
Phone: 705-523-4900
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1493 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B7
Canada
Phone: 7056735035
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rya Boscariol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Boscariol ( CPSO# 88600 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Barr Plastic Surgery
205 Douglas Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1E9

Business Address:
1493 Paris St
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYA HEATHER BOSCARIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSCARIOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Aug 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014