skip to content

Borys, Oksana Katherine

CPSO#: 93509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Shlapak, Oksana Katherine (used until: 03 Dec 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Neurology Clinic
581 Argus Rd
Suite 201
Oakville ON  L6J 3J4
Phone: 905-844-7444
Fax: 905-844-9444 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Oksana Borys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Borys ( CPSO# 93509 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J4
Phone Number: (905) 844-7444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OKSANA KATHERINE BORYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORYS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015