skip to content

Borowy-Borowski, Paul George

CPSO#: 98730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2696 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Borowy-Boroeski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Borowy-Borowski ( CPSO# 98730 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2696

Business Address:
Brant Community Healthcare System
Department of Laboratory Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL GEORGE BOROWY-BOROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROWY-BOROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017