skip to content

Borowoy, Alan Michael

CPSO#: 89031

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Lakeside Terrace, Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-881-9810
Fax: 705-915-3500 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Borowoy and Zborovski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Borowoy ( CPSO# 89031 )
Dr. S. Zborovski ( CPSO# 95264 )

Business Address:
201-11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 881-9810

Business Address:
302-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-3766

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALAN MICHAEL BOROWOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROWOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012