skip to content

Boroujerdi, Mehrnaz

CPSO#: 92305

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Fax: (416) 778-1400 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHRNAZ BOROUJERDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROUJERDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2009 to 18 Dec 2009
EL - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015