skip to content

Boron, Susan Pearl

CPSO#: 28054

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Susan Boron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Hanover Medical Associates 118 7th Ave Hanover ON N4N 3L9
Date Received: 09 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Susan Pearl Boron to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2018:

An assessment of Dr. Boron’s practice was conducted by the College. As a result of the assessment, upon her return to practice:

Dr. Boron will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.


Dr. Boron will engage in professional education in record-keeping and documentation.

Dr. Boron’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.