skip to content

Born, Abraham

CPSO#: 29560

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B-4H6
Fax: 437-317-9832 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Universal Sleep Disorders Clinic
2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B-4H6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Diagnostics and Consulting
1 - 820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B-1K2
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Born Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Born ( CPSO# 29560 )

Business Address:
302 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 225-9299

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical record requests for 4800 Leslie office may be addressed to: [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:21 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM BORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1976 to 17 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1977